MA H45 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick bank for Margaret C. Henderson, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. House Rules.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Margaret C. Henderson, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-03-03 | House | Enacted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-01-17 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-01-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-01-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H45 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H45.pdf |