MA H45 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michelle Shuman, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michele Shuman, an employee of the Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-02-12 | House | Enacted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H222 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H45 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H45.pdf |