MA H450 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4544
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to industrial wastewater discharge of dental facilities. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to industrial wastewater discharge of dental facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4544 |
2017-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H144 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S465 (Similar To) 2017-09-14 - Accompanied S478
H4434 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4506 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2018
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S465 (Similar To) 2017-09-14 - Accompanied S478
H4434 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4506 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2018
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H450.pdf |