MA H4505 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the uses of the land owned by the Commercial Wharf East Condominium and its condominium unit owners in the city of Boston under the tidelands law. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Authorizing Commercial Wharf East Condominium Association under the Tidelands Public Trust Doctrine and preventing residents from being forced to leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4505 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4505.pdf |