MA H4532 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michael Lewis, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael Lewis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4539 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4539 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4740 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
H4031 (Similar To) 2023-08-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4740 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
H4031 (Similar To) 2023-08-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4532 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4532.pdf |