MA H4548 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Mariano of Quincy, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4389). July 25, 2016.
Title
An act authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to acquire certain parcels of land in the city known as the town of Weymouth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #670 [Yeas 38 to Nays 0] |
2016-07-31 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 554) |
2016-07-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-25 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-25 | House | Substituted for H4389 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4548.pdf |