MA H4549 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4045
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill providing for capital facility repairs and improvements for the Commonwealth (House, No. 4045), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4549).
Title
Providing for capital facility repairs and improvements for the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #416 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House On Enactment State Loan Yea and Nay No. 367 (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House On acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 366 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House On Enactment State Loan Yea and Nay No. 367 (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House On acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 366 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #416 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-06-06 | House | Enacted - 145 YEAS to 3 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 367) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-06-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee of conference report accepted - 144 YEAS to 3 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 366) |
2018-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2018-06-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported on H4045 |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4045 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4549
S2244 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - See H4045
S2279 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - see S2244
H4018 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Published as amended, see H4045
S2244 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - See H4045
S2279 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - see S2244
H4018 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Published as amended, see H4045