MA H4554 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to court ordered parenting time. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to parenting time rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4693 |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4693 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4554 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4554.pdf |