MA H4560 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4568
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-19)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of home addresses and telephone numbers of certain employees of the Department of Children and Families. The Judiciary.
Title
Protecting department of children and families social workers’ home addresses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4568 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-12-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary |
2014-12-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4568 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4560 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4560.pdf |