MA H4568 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4677
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Ferguson of Holden and Zlotnik of Gardner, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Kimberly N. Ferguson, Jonathan D. Zlotnik and Stephan Hay that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance, in consultation with the Department of Conservation and Recreation, be authorized to convey to the town of Westminster a certain parcel of land located within the Leominster State Forest. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the town of Westminster to acquire state forest land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4677 |
2018-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-05-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3905 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2018
H4677 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4677 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4568 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4568.pdf |