MA H4569 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4483
Note: Legislation replaced by H4576
Note: Legislation replaced by H4576
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to job creation and workforce development
Title
Relative to job creation and workforce development
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-08-11 | House | For message, see H4576 |
2016-08-10 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2016-08-10 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 219 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #679 [Yeas 38 to Nays 1] |
2016-07-31 | House | Enacted 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 558) |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-31 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2016-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-31 | House | Reported on H4483 |
2016-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4483 (Replaced by) 2016-07-31 - Reported by H4569
H4576 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - See H4569
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
H4576 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - See H4569
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4569 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4569.pdf |