MA H4581 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read for its information and returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read for its information and returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Communication from the Division of Energy Resources of the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs (under the provisions of section 12 of Chapter 25A of the General Laws) submitting regulations to 225 CMR 21, Clean Peak Energy Portfolio Standard (CPS).
Title
Communication from the Division of Energy Resources of the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs (under the provisions of section 12 of Chapter 25A of the General Laws) submitting regulations to 225 CMR 21, Clean Peak Energy Portfolio Standard (CPS).
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read for its information and returned to the House |
2020-05-18 | House | Placed on file |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4581 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4581.pdf |