MA H4592 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to appoint Paul O'Brien a police officer notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Directing the City of Boston Police Department to waive the maximum age requirement for police officers for Paul O'Brien
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-19 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-07-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-06-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4071 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2024
H5009 (Similar To) 2024-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2952 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H5054 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2958 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H5009 (Similar To) 2024-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2952 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H5054 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2958 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4592 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4592.pdf |