MA H4598 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1009
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to failed septic systems
Title
Relative to failed septic systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-28 | House | New draft of H1009 |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1009 (Replaces) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4598 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4598.pdf |