MA H46 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H30
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Accompanying the sixteenth recommendation of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security (House, No. 30)
Title
Accompanying the sixteenth recommendation of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security (House, No. 30)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-05-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-03-29 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-03-29 | Accompanied by H30 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 7/9 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room B2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H30 (Replaces) 2010-03-29 - Accompanied H46
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00046.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00046.htm |