MA H46 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to an Americans with Disabilities paratransit program. Transportation.
Title
Relative to an ADA paratransit program riders' bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-08-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H46 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H46.pdf |