MA H4609 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1975
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing benefits for permanent functional loss
Title
Providing benefits for permanent functional loss
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] |
Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-04-04 | House | New draft of H1975 and H2053 |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1975 (Replaces) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4609
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4609 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4609.pdf |