MA H4616 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3504
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting motor vehicle dealer documentation fees
Title
Limiting motor vehicle dealer documentation fees
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Transportation | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-31 | House | New draft of H3504 |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3504 (Replaces) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4616
S239 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H407 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S239 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H407 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4616 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4616.pdf |