MA H462 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4630
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to develop a high quality pre-kindergarten education grant program. Education.
Title
Ensuring High Quality Pre-Kindergarten Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4630 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 17, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4630 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H462 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H462.pdf |