MA H4644 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the city of Woburn to issue additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Woburn to issue additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4708 |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-09-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4708 (Replaced by) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2016
H350 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H350 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4644 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4644.pdf |