MA H4646 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4798
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Muradian of Grafton and Senator Moore, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of David K. Muradian, Jr., and Michael O. Moore that James J. Malloy be authorized to buy back creditable service time from the Worcester Regional Retirement System. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing James J. Malloy to purchase creditable service from the Worcester regional retirement board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4798 |
2018-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2018 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-06-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H4798 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H4798 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4646.pdf |