MA H4652 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the position of auditor in the city of Holyoke. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To remove auditor position from city charter to instead create position under city ordinance, remove residency requirement, and to set term limits
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1755 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3459 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H4036 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2017
H3459 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H4036 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4652 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4652.pdf |