MA H4666 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4535
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 187 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 187 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the appointment of retired firefighters as special firefighters in the city of Quincy
Title
Authorizing the appointment of retired firefighters as special firefighters in the city of Quincy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 187 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-08-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-08-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-06-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-06-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-05-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-05-28 | House | New draft of H4535 |
2024-05-28 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4535 (Replaces) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4666
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4666 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4666.pdf |