MA H4683 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the school committee and the housing authority in the town of Grafton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the town charter in the town of Grafton relative to the town school committee and the Grafton housing authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-07-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4682 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4685 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4685 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4683 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4683.pdf |