MA H4698 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4130
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the direct wine shipper license
Title
Relative to the direct wine shipper license
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-07-30 | House | Enacted |
2024-07-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2024-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2024-07-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-22 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2886 |
2024-07-22 | Senate | Read second |
2024-07-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-07-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2886 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-05-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-30 | House | New draft of H4130 |
2024-05-30 | House | Pending new draft of H4130 |
2024-05-30 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4130 (Replaces) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4698
H266 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4130
H266 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4130
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4698 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4698.pdf |