MA H4720 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4782
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Quincy be authorized to grant abatements of certain real estate taxes to Kristin and Sean Healy of said city. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Quincy to grant veteran’s abatements of real estate taxes to certain veterans in the city of Quincy
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Mariano [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4782 |
2018-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-09 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H409 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
S1932 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1933 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H393 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4782 (Replaced by) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 235 of the Acts of 2018
S1932 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1933 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H393 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4782 (Replaced by) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 235 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4720.pdf |