MA H474 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the collection and dissemination of student data. Education.
Title
Relative to student data privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4143 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H124 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4623
H3077 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1566 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2016
H1567 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4370
H473 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H4768 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 416 of the Acts of 2016
H124 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4623
H3077 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1566 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2016
H1567 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4370
H473 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H4768 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 416 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H474 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H474.pdf |