MA H4741 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Newbury be authorized to prohibit use of second generation anticoagulant rodenticides in said town. Environment and Natural Resources. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Newbury to adopt a bylaw restricting the use of second generation anticoagulant rodenticides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-07-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H4742 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4741 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4741.pdf |