MA H4744 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S603
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create a commission to determine the feasibility of voluntary acquisition of flood risk properties and structures
Title
To create a commission to determine the feasibility of voluntary acquisition of flood risk properties and structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-05-09 | House | New draft of S603 and H983 |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S603 (Replaces) 2022-05-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4744
H983 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4744
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
H983 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4744
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4744 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4744.pdf |