MA H4753 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4770
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Reading be authorized to issue additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages and for the sale of wines and malt beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Reading to grant licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4770 |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-12-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4770 (Replaced by) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 464 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4770 (Replaced by) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 464 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4753 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4753.pdf |