MA H4830 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an excise tax for certain applicable taxpayers in excess of the maximum permissible for single-family residences. Revenue.
Title
Ending hedge fund control of homes in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-07-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2024-06-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4707 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Published as amended, see H4726
S2474 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3929 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
H4138 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H4707
S2474 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3929 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
H4138 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H4707
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4830 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4830.pdf |