MA H4834 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S972
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement reporting
Title
Relative to retirement reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-07-10 | House | New draft of S972 and H1445 |
2024-07-10 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S972 (Replaces) 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4834
H1445 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4834
H4697 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4352 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4478 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4697
H1445 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4834
H4697 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4352 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4478 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4697
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4834 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4834.pdf |