MA H4837 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4054
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management to convey certain land to the city known as the town of Franklin.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management to convey certain land to the city known as the town of Franklin.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 500 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 500 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #562 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 500 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #562 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #562 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 500) |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-27 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-27 | House | New draft of H4054 |
2018-07-27 | House | Pending new draft of H4054 |
2018-07-27 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4054 (Replaces) 2018-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4837
H4839 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H1412 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H3458 (Similar To) 2017-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4054
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4839 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H1412 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H3458 (Similar To) 2017-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4054
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken