MA H4878 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5018
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-1)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the housing market during the COVID-19 emergency and recovery. Housing.
Title
To guarantee housing stability during the COVID-19 emergency and recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5018 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday October 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2020 from 09:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5018 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4878 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4878.pdf |