MA H4889 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 345 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 345 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge on Schoosett Street in the town of Pembroke as the Judith Winsor Smith memorial bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Pembroke as the Judith Winsor Smith Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 345 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-09-01 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-08-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2617 (Similar To) 2022-08-18 - Accompanied H4099
H3469 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2021
H3459 (Similar To) 2022-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2022
H3969 (Similar To) 2022-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2022
H4099 (Similar To) 2022-08-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2022
H3469 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2021
H3459 (Similar To) 2022-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2022
H3969 (Similar To) 2022-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2022
H4099 (Similar To) 2022-08-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4889 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4889.pdf |