MA H4892 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Arlington be authorized to place upon a town ballot a question relative to increasing the number of licenses for all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Arlington to place upon a town ballot a question to increase the number of licenses for all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-11-19 | House | Enacted |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-08-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4892.pdf |