MA H4895 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4510
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on August 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing raising the maximum retirement age of special police officers in the city of Methuen to 70 years old
Title
Authorizing raising the maximum retirement age of special police officers in the city of Methuen to 70 years old
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Service | Rep. Ryan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Estela Reyes [D] | Rep. Francisco Paulino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-08-22 | House | New draft of H4510 |
2024-08-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4510 (Replaces) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4895
H4987 (Similar To) 2024-08-21 - Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2937 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2024
H4987 (Similar To) 2024-08-21 - Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2937 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4895.pdf |