MA H4910 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the security of vital records and verification of identity
Title
The security of vital records and verification of identity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-26 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-08-23 | Enacted | |
2010-08-19 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-08-19 | Rules suspended | |
2010-08-19 | Committee recommended ought to pass | |
2010-08-02 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-07-31 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-21 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-21 | Substituted for H2064 | |
2010-07-20 | Recommended new draft for H2064 | |
2010-07-20 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h04910.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht04/ht04910.htm |