MA H4942 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2602
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to innocent spouses
Title
Relative to innocent spouses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-10-25 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-25 | House | New draft of H2602 |
2018-10-25 | House | Pending new draft of H2602 |
2018-10-25 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H2602 (Replaces) 2018-10-25 - New draft substituted, see H4942
H3339 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied H2602
H1556 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4955 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 365 of the Acts of 2018
H3339 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied H2602
H1556 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4955 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 365 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4942.pdf |