MA H4977 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 206 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 206 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Felix Cruz, an employee of the Department of Youth Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Felix Cruz, an employee of the Department of Youth Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 206 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-11-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-11-06 | House | Enacted |
2020-11-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-11-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-10-01 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-09-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2020-09-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4977.pdf |