MA H4987 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the age limit for retired police officers serving as special police officers in the town of Weston. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Increasing the age limit for retired police officers serving as special police officers in the town of Weston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-08-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4759 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4849
H4849 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2024
H4190 (Similar To) 2024-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2024
H4001 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4190
H4849 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2024
H4190 (Similar To) 2024-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2024
H4001 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4190
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4987 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4987.pdf |