MA H499 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Accompanied H455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Accompanied H455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mandate the accreditation of secondary graphic communications education in vocational and technical schools. Education.
Title
Mandating the accreditation of secondary graphic communications education in vocational and technical schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | House | Accompanied H455 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H455 (Replaced by) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H499 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H499.pdf |