MA H4990 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4796
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Sherborn to grant 1 additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Sherborn to grant 1 additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-09-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-09-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-08-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-08-12 | House | New draft of H4796 |
2024-08-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4796 (Replaces) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4990
H4992 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4893 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4992
H4176 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4867
H4992 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4893 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4992
H4176 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4867
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4990 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4990.pdf |