MA H4994 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4973
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the state pool for children in the town of Clinton as the Liberty M. Arnold-Simon memorial children’s pool.
Title
Designating the state pool for children in the town of Clinton as the Liberty M. Arnold-Simon memorial children’s pool.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-26 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-10 | House | New draft of H4973 |
2018-12-10 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4973 (Replaces) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4994
S2479 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2018
S2478 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2018
S2479 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2018
S2478 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4994 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4994.pdf |