MA H4998 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4842
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Dedham to continue the employment of William Spillane as Chief of the Fire Department
Title
Authorizing the town of Dedham to continue the employment of William Spillane as Chief of the Fire Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-09-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-11 | House | New draft of H4842 |
2022-07-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4842 (Replaces) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
S2373 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S611 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2563 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H2564 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S2373 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S611 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2563 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H2564 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4998 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4998.pdf |