MA H50 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for David Ogar, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Temporary committee on House Rules.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for David Ogar, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-03-12 | House | Enacted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendments |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-02-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the committee on temporary Committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H50 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H50.pdf |