MA H5001 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the public and private diagnostic testing infrastructure in the Commonwealth and to make recommendations to increase preparedness for future pandemics, epidemics and emerging pathogens. Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management.
Title
Increasing diagnostic testing preparedness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-12-19 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-12-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-19 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2022-09-15 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-09-06 | House | Recommitted to the committee on COVID-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management |
2022-09-06 | House | Reported on H5203 |
2022-09-06 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5203 |
2022-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management |
2022-05-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H487 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H4945 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Read for information and returned
H4537 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4389 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4968 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5203 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
H955 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H4945 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Read for information and returned
H4537 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4389 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4968 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5203 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
H955 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5001 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5001.pdf |