MA H5004 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Leominster be authorized to pay a certain unpaid bill. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Leominster to pay a certain unpaid bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-12-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1132 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2017
H4924 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4924 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5004 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5004.pdf |