MA H5012 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Acton be authorized to establish a minimum charge for checkout bags in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Acton to establish a minimum charge for a checkout bag
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-10-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-10-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-08-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5013 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5439
H5010 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2022
H5172 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5439 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 369 of the Acts of 2022
H5013 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5439
H5010 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2022
H5172 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5439 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 369 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5012 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5012.pdf |