MA H5014 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4975
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Ashland to establish a special revenue fund for an economic development funding program
Title
Authorizing the town of Ashland to establish a special revenue fund for an economic development funding program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-21 | House | New draft of H4975 |
2018-12-21 | House | Reported from the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4975 (Replaces) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5014 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5014.pdf |